+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor