+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/6/2019
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Record vote
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/1/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor