+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Correction in referral
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor