+ − Actions (36)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor