+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (63)
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House passage as amended reported
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor