+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor