+ − Actions (37)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate