+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Technology
- Read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate