+ − Actions (39)
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to International Relations and Trade
- Read first time
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor