+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Ways & Means
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor