+ − Actions (27)
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor