+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor