+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Education
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate