+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor