+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor