+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate