+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor