+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Intent Calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate