+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/22
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/16/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate