+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate