+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (71)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report withdrawn
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House recommits to conf. comm.-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House recommits to conference committee
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Corrected Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor