+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On September 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On September 2, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On September 2, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- House passage as amended reported
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On September 2, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On September 2, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On September 1, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On August 31, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On August 24, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on8/24/2021
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On August 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On August 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
On August 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Read first time
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Scheduled for public hearing on 8/7/2021
- Record vote
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor