+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate