+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/29/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/22/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate