+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate