+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Vote reconsidered
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate