+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (79)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/1/2019
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor