+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/15
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Rules suspended
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor