+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor