+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Education
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/20/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor