+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate