+ − Actions (35)
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Co-author authorized
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate