+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor