+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor