+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to suspend regular order fails
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor