+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor