+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/18/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor