+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/21
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/30/2021
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/29/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor