+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor