+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate