+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate