+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/12/2021
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/13/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor