+ − Actions (55)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Refer to s/c on Base Realign Closure by Pres
- Read first time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate