+ − Actions (42)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/10
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor