+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor