+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Record vote
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment tabled
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor