+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor