+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor