+ − Actions (39)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Correction in referral
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor