+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor